EP1859399 - INTEGRATION OF DATA MANAGEMENT OPERATIONS INTO A WORKFLOW SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, New York 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRASSELT, Mike Asternweg 2 70771 Leinfelden-echterdingen / DE | 02 /
KLOPPMANN, Matthias In Der Halde 91/4 D-71063 Sindelfingen / DE | 03 /
MAIER, Albert Thomas-mann-strasse 4 D-72072 Tuebingen-kilchberg / DE | 04 /
SUHRE, Oliver c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 05 /
TSCHAFFLER, Matthias c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 06 /
WOLFSON, Charles, Daniel 7916 Jester Boulevard Austin, Texas 78750 / US | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
GRASSELT, Mike Asternweg 2 70771 Leinfelden-echterdingen / DE | ||
02 /
KLOPPMANN, Matthias In Der Halde 91/4 D-71063 Sindelfingen / DE | |||
03 /
MAIER, Albert Thomas-mann-strasse 4 D-72072 Tuebingen-kilchberg / DE | |||
04 /
SUHRE, Oliver Heusteigstrasse 83 D-70180 Stuttgart / DE | |||
05 /
TSCHAFFLER, Matthias Hewrrenbergerstrasse 35 D-71083 Herrenberg / DE | |||
06 /
WOLFSON, Charles, Daniel 7916 Jester Boulevard Austin, Texas 78750 / US | Representative(s) | Pyecroft, Justine Nicola C. Intellectual Property Law IBM United Kingdom Limited Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Watson, Justine Nicola C. Intellectual Property Law, IBM United Kingdom Limited, Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 06708526.6 | 27.02.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006EP60293 | Priority number, date | US20050070529 | 01.03.2005 Original published format: US 70529 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006092388 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1859399 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRATION VON DATENVERWALTUNGSOPERATIONEN IN EIN ARBEITSABLAUFSYSTEM | [2007/48] | English: | INTEGRATION OF DATA MANAGEMENT OPERATIONS INTO A WORKFLOW SYSTEM | [2007/48] | French: | INTEGRATION D'OPERATIONS DE GESTION DE DONNEES DANS UN SYSTEME DE FLUX DE TRAVAUX | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 06.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004114061 (REUTERS AMERICA [US], et al) [X] 1-39 * column W *; | [X]WO2005001726 (IBM [US], et al) [X] 1-39 * column W *; | [X]US2004172445 (SINGH KAVIRAJ [US], et al) [X] 1-39 * column W *; | [X] - EILAM T ET AL, "Using a utility computing framework to develop utility systems", IBM SYSTEMS JOURNAL, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CO., ARMONK, NY, US, (20040301), vol. 43, no. 1, ISSN 0018-8670, pages 97 - 120, XP002295608 [X] 1-39 * column W * | [X] - M. BRAMBILLA, S. CERI ET AL., "Declarative specification of Web applications exploiting Web services and workflows", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2004 ACM SIGMOD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGEMENT OF DATA, Paris, (2004), URL: http://portal.acm.org/citation.cfm?id=1007688&dl=GUIDE&coll=GUIDE&CFID=15151515&CFTOKEN=6184618, (20060712), XP002390303 [X] 1-39 * column W * |