09.03.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
28.11.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.07.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] |
16.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
22.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
10.12.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
18.11.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.09.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.05.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] |
07.05.2010 |
First examination report |
|
03.05.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] |
18.12.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] |
25.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
21.11.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
21.11.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
11.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|