05.10.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] |
28.10.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
19.10.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.10.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.05.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
21.02.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.09.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
26.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
13.06.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
13.06.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
03.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
30.11.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
22.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|