Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8075972 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2011 | B2 | US2009022933 | 22.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005111244 | 07.04.2005 | WO2006JP307448 | 07.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4603996B | Global Dossier | 22.12.2010 | B2 | JP2006313612 | 16.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005111244 | 07.04.2005 | JP2006104917 | 06.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1873771 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2011 | B1 | EP1873771 | 27.10.2010 | A4 | EP1873771 | 02.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005111244 | 07.04.2005 | WO2006JP307448 | 07.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101156203B | 15.09.2010 | B | CN101156203 | 02.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005111244 | 07.04.2005 | WO2006JP307448 | 07.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1116288 | 19.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005111244 | 07.04.2005 | WO2006JP307448 | 07.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006109722 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005111244 | 07.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200703313 | 16.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005111244 | 07.04.2005 |