EP1873771 - OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Kagaku Media Co., Ltd. 1-23, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/36] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Kagaku Media Co., Ltd. 31-19, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUROMOTO, S., Mitsubishi Kagaku Media Co., Ltd. 31-19, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | 02 /
MIZUNO, Masaaki, Mitsubishi Kagaku Media Co., Ltd. 31-19, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1080014 / JP | 03 /
UCHIDA, Naoyuki, Mitsubishi Kagaku Media Co., Ltd. 31-19, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2011/48] |
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
FUROMOTO, S., Mitsubishi Kagaku Media Co., Ltd. 31-19, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
02 /
MIZUNO, Masaaki, Mitsubishi Kagaku Media Co., Ltd. 31-19, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1080014 / JP | |||
03 /
UCHIDA, Naoyuki, Mitsubishi Kagaku Media Co., Ltd. 31-19, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06731395.7 | 07.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006JP307448 | Priority number, date | JP20050111244 | 07.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005111244 | [2008/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006109722 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873771 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1873771 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
G11B7/2578 (EP,US);
G11B7/2467 (EP,US);
G11B7/2492 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24612 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24618 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25417 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25706 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25708 (EP,US);
G11B2007/2571 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25711 (EP,US);
G11B7/245 (EP,US);
G11B7/2463 (EP,US);
G11B7/2472 (EP,US);
G11B7/2475 (EP,US);
G11B7/248 (EP,US);
G11B7/2532 (EP,US);
G11B7/2534 (EP,US);
G11B7/2542 (EP,US);
G11B7/2548 (EP,US);
G11B7/256 (EP,US);
G11B7/259 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/29] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2008/01] | English: | OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM | [2008/01] | French: | SUPPORT D ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2007 | Translation filed | 18.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 17.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T]DE4115321 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP], et al) [T] 1-7* list of bulk thermal conductivities of metal, and some oxides, nitrides, sulfides and carbides; page 9 *; | [A]US2003137921 (HIGUCHI TAKANOBU [JP]) [A] 1-7 * AlNx as thermal conduction material; too thick (approx. 50 nm); paragraphs [0025] , [0032]; figure 1C *; | [A]JP2003308633 (HITACHI MAXELL) [A] 1-7 * only thickness of Al-Ti heat sink layer is too thick (50 nm); paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015]; figure 1; example 1 * |