11.09.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] |
31.05.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.01.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.11.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
13.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.04.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
08.04.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.12.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] |
24.12.2010 |
Change - inventor |
published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] |
10.09.2010 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
10.09.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
02.09.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.06.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.03.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] |
30.10.2009 |
First examination report |
|
29.10.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.07.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] |
26.06.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
26.06.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
13.05.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
13.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.05.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
03.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.01.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
25.01.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
14.12.2007 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
16.11.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] |
16.11.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] |
14.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|