Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012029896 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66269905 | 17.03.2005 | US37892806 | 17.03.2006 | US201113073901 | 28.03.2011 | US74942910 | 29.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010250218 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US66269905 | 17.03.2005 | US37892806 | 17.03.2006 | US74942910 | 29.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007219768 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37892806 | 17.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1866824 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2009 | A4 | EP1866824 | 19.12.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US66269905 | 17.03.2005 | WO2006US10053 | 17.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2439675 | 02.01.2008 | A | GB0719562D0 | 14.11.2007 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US66269905 | 17.03.2005 | WO2006US10053 | 17.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006099624 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2007 | A3 | WO2006099624 | 09.11.2006 | A9 | WO2006099624 | 21.09.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US66269905 | 17.03.2005 |