|
03.08.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.08.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2007 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.10.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
19.07.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.07.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.07.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.07.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.03.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.03.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
16 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.02.2007 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.02.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
12.02.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
12.02.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
12.02.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.02.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
01.08.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
25 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |