17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
23.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
16.12.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
12.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
05.08.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
28.08.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] |
21.08.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.08.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.08.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.04.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.06.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.02.2011 |
First examination report |
|
24.02.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.03.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] |
16.10.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] |
08.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |
06.05.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
30.11.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
06.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|