Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8772435 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2014 | B2 | US2008163790 | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91103906 | 07.04.2006 | US67101005 | 13.04.2005 | WO2006US13604 | 07.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101334798B | Global Dossier | 29.11.2013 | B1 | KR20070120597 | 24.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US67101005 | 13.04.2005 | WO2006US13604 | 07.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5340723B | Global Dossier | 13.11.2013 | B2 | JP2008536664 | 11.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US67101005 | 13.04.2005 | WO2006US13604 | 07.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1871515 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2015 | B1 | EP1871515 | 02.01.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US67101005 | 13.04.2005 | WO2006US13604 | 07.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101175558B | 09.01.2013 | B | CN101175558 | 07.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US67101005 | 13.04.2005 | WO2006US13604 | 07.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102974264B | 02.09.2015 | B | CN102974264 | 20.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US67101005 | 13.04.2005 | CN200680017116 | 07.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006113258 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2007 | A3 | WO2006113258 | 26.10.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US67101005 | 13.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI402097B | 21.07.2013 | B | TW200702045 | 16.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US67101005 | 13.04.2005 |