EP1871515 - DISPERSANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, OH 44141-3247 / US | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMPSON, Neil L. P.O. Box 42 Hexagon Tower Blackley Greater Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | 02 /
THETFORD, Dean P.o. Box 42 Hexagon Tower Blackley Greater Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Weber, Thomas Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Weber, Thomas von Kreisler Selting Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1, Deichmannhaus am Dom 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 06749848.5 | 07.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006US13604 | Priority number, date | US20050671010P | 13.04.2005 Original published format: US 671010 P | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006113258 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1871515 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1871515 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01F17/00, C09B67/00, C09D11/00, C09D7/02, C08G69/44, C08G81/00, C08G69/48 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
C08G73/0206 (EP,US);
C09B67/006 (KR);
C09B67/0069 (EP,US);
C09B67/009 (EP,US);
C09D11/03 (EP,KR,US);
C09D177/12 (KR);
C09D7/45 (EP,US);
C09K23/14 (EP,KR,US);
C09K23/16 (EP,KR,US);
C09K23/28 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/40] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DISPERSIONSMITTEL | [2008/01] | English: | DISPERSANTS | [2008/01] | French: | DISPERSANTS | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 28.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2006 | AT | 30.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | BG | 30.09.2015 | CY | 30.09.2015 | CZ | 30.09.2015 | DK | 30.09.2015 | EE | 30.09.2015 | ES | 30.09.2015 | FI | 30.09.2015 | IT | 30.09.2015 | LT | 30.09.2015 | LV | 30.09.2015 | MC | 30.09.2015 | PL | 30.09.2015 | RO | 30.09.2015 | SE | 30.09.2015 | SI | 30.09.2015 | SK | 30.09.2015 | TR | 30.09.2015 | GR | 31.12.2015 | IS | 30.01.2016 | PT | 01.02.2016 | IE | 07.04.2016 | LU | 07.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.04.2006 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.04.2006 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 07.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 30.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001240780 ; | [X]WO8102395 (SADOLIN & HOLMBLAD AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,19-22 * page 3, paragraphs 2,4; claims 1-6 * * page 5 *; | [X]EP0189385 (BERGVIK KEMI AB [SE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,19,20 * page 4, paragraph 4; examples 11,12,15; claims 1,4,6,9,10 * * page 6, paragraph VII * * page 12 *; | [X]EP0322154 (PFIZER [US]) [X] 23 * example 5; claims 3,6 *; | [X]EP0768321 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [X] 1-8,10-13,16,19-23 * page 3, line 47 - page 4, line 34; examples 4,8; claims 1-11 * * page 5, line 25 - line 28 * * page 6, line 28 - line 51 * * page 9 *; | [DA]WO9955763 (AVECIA LTD [GB], et al) [DA] 1-9,11-13,16,19-23 * claims 1-18 *; | [DA]WO0121298 (AVECIA LTD [GB], et al) [DA] 1-13 * claims 1-19 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020701), vol. 2000, no. 26, & JP2001240780 A 20010904 (NIPPON STEEL CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-9,11-13,16,19-23 * abstract * | Examination | GB1305715 | EP0164817 | JPH05156008 | WO9614344 | WO9819784 |