06.03.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
28.11.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.05.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.06.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.02.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.12.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.08.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.06.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.01.2010 |
First examination report |
|
09.10.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] |
28.08.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] |
01.05.2009 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
30.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.07.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
23.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
14.12.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
22.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|