EP1876947 - LIGHT TRANSMISSION SIMULATOR FOR PULSE OXIMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pronk Technologies Inc. 550 Alta Vista Avenue South Pasadena CA 91030 / US | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUITER, Karl, A. 550 Alta Vista Avenue South Pasadena, California 91030 / US | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Hart, Deborah Mary, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Hart, Deborah Mary, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/03] | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06751782.1 | 27.04.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006US16261 | Priority number, date | US20050677251P | 02.05.2005 Original published format: US 677251 P | US20050726639P | 14.10.2005 Original published format: US 726639 P | US20060379763 | 21.04.2006 Original published format: US 379763 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006119024 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1876947 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/1495 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTÜBERTRAGUNGSSIMULATOR FÜR PULSOXIMETER | [2008/03] | English: | LIGHT TRANSMISSION SIMULATOR FOR PULSE OXIMETER | [2008/03] | French: | SIMULATEUR DE TRANSMISSION DE LUMIERE DESTINE A UN OXYMETRE A IMPULSION | [2008/03] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 28.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4631466 (SHERWIN GARY W [US]) [A] 9 * column 3, line 30 - column 6, line 30 *; | [Y]EP0363219 (MEDEX INC [US]) [Y] 1-5,8,9 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 23 *; | [XY]US5348005 (MERRICK EDWIN B [US], et al) [X] 6,7 * figure 7 * * column 3, line 47 - column 8, line 41 * [Y] 1-5,8,9; | [A]EP0623306 (DIASENSE INC [US]) [A] 1-9* column 3, line 24 - column 6, line 45 * | International search | [A]US5348005 (MERRICK EDWIN B [US], et al) |