Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007139663 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US43934006 | 23.05.2006 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US43906206 | 23.05.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007139655 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US43934006 | 23.05.2006 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US43906206 | 23.05.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007139653 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US43934006 | 23.05.2006 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US43906206 | 23.05.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007126855 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US43934006 | 23.05.2006 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US43906206 | 23.05.2006 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007123631 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US43934006 | 23.05.2006 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US43906206 | 23.05.2006 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007053550 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2007 | A8 | WO2007053550 | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007053549 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007053548 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2007 | A3 | WO2007053548 | 10.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007053460 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007053434 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007050118 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001574 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001561 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001551 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A8 | WO2007001551 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001534 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006137961 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2008 | A8 | WO2006137961 | 28.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006127831 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68485405 | 26.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006127755 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2007 | A3 | WO2006127755 | 30.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US68481305 | 26.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006094167 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006094166 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006094165 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006094148 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006094133 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2007 | A8 | WO2006094133 | 08.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004096354 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42661303 | 29.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9765203 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2017 | B2 | US2016017125 | 21.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US9157008 | 25.04.2008 | US201514869705 | 29.09.2015 | US201213596805 | 28.08.2012 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9765181 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2017 | B2 | US2016009951 | 14.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US201313776038 | 25.02.2013 | US201213348677 | 12.01.2012 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US201514865705 | 25.09.2015 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9534079 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2017 | B2 | US2016009858 | 14.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213709097 | 10.12.2012 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US201113016147 | 28.01.2011 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US201514865714 | 25.09.2015 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016009857 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113007838 | 17.01.2011 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US201514865681 | 25.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9598533 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2017 | B2 | US2013303692 | 14.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US201313941362 | 12.07.2013 | US201113215511 | 23.08.2011 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US78419310 | 20.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9181388 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2015 | B2 | US2013225762 | 29.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US201313776038 | 25.02.2013 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US201213348677 | 12.01.2012 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9175134 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2015 | B2 | US2013101773 | 25.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213709097 | 10.12.2012 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US201113016147 | 28.01.2011 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013072628 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US201213658249 | 23.10.2012 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US201213348677 | 12.01.2012 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9169388 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2015 | B2 | US2013059957 | 07.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US9157008 | 25.04.2008 | US201213596805 | 28.08.2012 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8415450 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2013 | B2 | US2012108715 | 03.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US201213348677 | 12.01.2012 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9181387 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2015 | B2 | US2012021158 | 26.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US201113162870 | 17.06.2011 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8507638 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2013 | B2 | US2011306730 | 15.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US78419310 | 20.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8133417 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2012 | B2 | US2011201703 | 18.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | US201113097348 | 29.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8304499 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2012 | B2 | US2011200774 | 18.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113097334 | 29.04.2011 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011189415 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113017352 | 31.01.2011 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8354491 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2013 | B2 | US2011146022 | 23.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US201113016147 | 28.01.2011 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011144266 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US201113017069 | 31.01.2011 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US72446810 | 16.03.2010 | US73128905 | 31.10.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US36551509 | 04.02.2009 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9169348 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2015 | B2 | US2011108503 | 12.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113007838 | 17.01.2011 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8119762 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2012 | B2 | US2011054091 | 03.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US94321710 | 10.11.2010 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8133967 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2012 | B2 | US2011017751 | 27.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010300918 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US85371710 | 10.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010298523 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US29468607 | 27.03.2007 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8101705 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2012 | B2 | US2010227971 | 09.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US78419310 | 20.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010184940 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US29469007 | 27.03.2007 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7906212 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2011 | B2 | US2010174034 | 08.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36177909 | 29.01.2009 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US72448010 | 16.03.2010 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7906211 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2011 | B2 | US2010174033 | 08.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36551509 | 04.02.2009 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US72446810 | 16.03.2010 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010174030 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36177909 | 29.01.2009 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US72449210 | 16.03.2010 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8067525 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2011 | B2 | US2010120979 | 13.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010096589 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010092705 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US47989309 | 08.06.2009 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010087574 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7704605 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2010 | B2 | US2009137735 | 28.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36551509 | 04.02.2009 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7740941 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2010 | B2 | US2009137723 | 28.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36177909 | 29.01.2009 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009093574 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US9156806 | 27.10.2006 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009093573 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US9157206 | 27.10.2006 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8299204 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2012 | B2 | US2008293882 | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US9157006 | 27.10.2006 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008293857 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US9156606 | 27.10.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8586701 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2013 | B2 | US2007276065 | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007270569 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007232779 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007232778 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7737246 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2010 | B2 | US2007142615 | 21.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US43934006 | 23.05.2006 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US43906206 | 23.05.2006 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007142511 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8193302 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2012 | B2 | US2007129531 | 07.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US43934006 | 23.05.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US43906206 | 23.05.2006 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007106054 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007105993 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007100125 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007100122 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007010650 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7812111 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2010 | B2 | US2007010649 | 11.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7781562 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2010 | B2 | US2006293495 | 28.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7855267 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2010 | B2 | US2006293494 | 28.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006287496 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7803441 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2010 | B2 | US2006287495 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006287494 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7838620 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2010 | B2 | US2006287493 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7807775 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2010 | B2 | US2006287492 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7842776 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2010 | B2 | US2006287491 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7812112 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2010 | B2 | US2006287490 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7985827 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2011 | B2 | US2006287489 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7576171 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2009 | B2 | US2006287488 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7834129 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2010 | B2 | US2006287487 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006287486 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006287485 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006287484 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7868128 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2011 | B2 | US2006287483 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8119761 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2012 | B2 | US2006287482 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8063173 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2011 | B2 | US2006287481 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006287480 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006287479 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8063172 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2011 | B2 | US2006287478 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006287477 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7807774 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2010 | B2 | US2006287476 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7902320 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2011 | B2 | US2006287474 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7893187 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2011 | B2 | US2006286394 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006286389 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7510768 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2009 | B2 | US2006286384 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7915376 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2011 | B2 | US2006286332 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7951900 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2011 | B2 | US2006286331 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006286330 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7893188 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2011 | B2 | US2006286329 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7906610 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2011 | B2 | US2006286328 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006286327 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7803440 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2010 | B2 | US2006286326 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7803439 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2010 | B2 | US2006286322 | 21.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006270806 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68485405 | 26.05.2005 | US43934006 | 23.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006270773 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68481305 | 26.05.2005 | US43906206 | 23.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7959998 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2011 | B2 | US2006247388 | 02.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7959836 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2011 | B2 | US2006235167 | 19.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006234073 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7955674 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2011 | B2 | US2006228507 | 12.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7462684 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2008 | B2 | US2006226565 | 12.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7786252 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2010 | B2 | US2006199921 | 07.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7968164 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2011 | B2 | US2006199919 | 07.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7964258 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2011 | B2 | US2006199904 | 07.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006199871 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7955533 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2011 | B2 | US2006197246 | 07.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004220631 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42661303 | 29.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10017606 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2018 | B2 | US2017174828 | 22.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US201313941362 | 12.07.2013 | US201113215511 | 23.08.2011 | US201715450278 | 06.03.2017 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US78419310 | 20.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090079212 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090079211 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080066704 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080059259 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080021013 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101543043B | Global Dossier | 07.08.2015 | B1 | KR20100023856 | 04.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101410145B | Global Dossier | 19.06.2014 | B1 | KR20080059258 | 26.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101410122B | Global Dossier | 25.06.2014 | B1 | KR20080066691 | 16.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101280717B | Global Dossier | 01.07.2013 | B1 | KR20080018997 | 29.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11937 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101274934B | Global Dossier | 14.06.2013 | B1 | KR20080053513 | 13.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101249616B | Global Dossier | 01.04.2013 | B1 | KR20080019219 | 03.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11962 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101249595B | Global Dossier | 01.04.2013 | B1 | KR20080021014 | 06.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11915 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101249552B | Global Dossier | 01.04.2013 | B1 | KR20080018996 | 29.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11968 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101249550B | Global Dossier | 02.04.2013 | B1 | KR20080021015 | 06.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11890 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101249547B | Global Dossier | 01.04.2013 | B1 | KR20080021016 | 06.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US12268 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101238995B | Global Dossier | 04.03.2013 | B1 | KR20080019220 | 03.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US12065 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018083952 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017039941 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6325991B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2018 | B2 | JP2015110798 | 18.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6325782B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2018 | B2 | JP2013249482 | 12.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5744802B | Global Dossier | 08.07.2015 | B2 | JP2012207235 | 25.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5611818B | Global Dossier | 22.10.2014 | B2 | JP2010526904 | 05.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | WO2008US05799 | 06.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010507717 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US15704 | 10.07.2007 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010507716 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US15701 | 10.07.2007 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5543714B | Global Dossier | 09.07.2014 | B2 | JP2009513801 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5543713B | Global Dossier | 09.07.2014 | B2 | JP2009513800 | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009513799 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009513792 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009513791 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009513237 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12627 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008547143 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11912 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008547046 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US12075 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008546868 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11970 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5408467B | Global Dossier | 05.02.2014 | B2 | JP2008546867 | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11937 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008546866 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11913 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008546865 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11890 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008546864 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11693 | 30.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008546603 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11926 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008546562 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US12660 | 30.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008546561 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12063 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008546560 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11873 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008546442 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11594 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544121 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11893 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5616581B | Global Dossier | 29.10.2014 | B2 | JP2008544037 | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US12268 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544036 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US12074 | 30.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544035 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12066 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5139274B | Global Dossier | 06.02.2013 | B2 | JP2008544034 | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US12065 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544033 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US12062 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5683786B | Global Dossier | 11.03.2015 | B2 | JP2008544032 | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11968 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544031 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11967 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544030 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11966 | 30.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5290754B | Global Dossier | 18.09.2013 | B2 | JP2008544029 | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11962 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544028 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11940 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544027 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11935 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544026 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11927 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5384936B | Global Dossier | 08.01.2014 | B2 | JP2008544025 | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11915 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544024 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US11914 | 30.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544023 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11911 | 30.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5431725B | Global Dossier | 05.03.2014 | B2 | JP2008544022 | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11910 | 30.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544021 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11909 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544020 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11700 | 30.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008544019 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11660 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008543610 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US11928 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008543425 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11891 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008543424 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11662 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5296384B | Global Dossier | 25.09.2013 | B2 | JP2008542450 | 27.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07531 | 02.03.2006 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5296385B | Global Dossier | 25.09.2013 | B2 | JP2008531830 | 14.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07532 | 02.03.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5243047B | Global Dossier | 24.07.2013 | B2 | JP2008531827 | 14.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07489 | 02.03.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008531354 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07535 | 02.03.2006 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008531353 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07439 | 02.03.2006 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006525078 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US42661303 | 29.04.2003 | WO2004US11924 | 19.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3686233 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2024 | B1 | EP3686233 | 29.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15002089 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | EP17163415 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | EP10014298 | 30.03.2006 | EP06749019 | 30.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11910 | 30.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3246055 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2020 | B1 | EP3246055 | 22.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15002089 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | EP10014298 | 30.03.2006 | EP06749019 | 30.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11910 | 30.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3031481 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2020 | B1 | EP3031481 | 15.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11962 | 30.03.2006 | EP06784332 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3017834 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | EP06749020 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2954910 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2017 | B1 | EP2954910 | 16.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | EP06749019 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | EP10014298 | 30.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2907640 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09012051 | 30.03.2006 | EP06758235 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2865398 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2018 | B1 | EP2865398 | 29.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | EP06749145 | 30.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2789639 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2017 | B1 | EP2789639 | 07.01.2015 | A3 | EP2789639 | 15.10.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | EP08767590 | 06.05.2008 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2444440 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2019 | B1 | EP2444440 | 15.10.2014 | A3 | EP2444440 | 25.04.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | EP06836651 | 27.10.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2333001 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2018 | B1 | EP2333001 | 15.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | EP06826819 | 27.10.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2332592 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2015 | B1 | EP2332592 | 15.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | EP06827057 | 27.10.2006 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2329856 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2019 | B1 | EP2329856 | 08.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | WO2004US11924 | 19.04.2004 | EP04760273 | 19.04.2004 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US42661303 | 29.04.2003 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | EP10007798 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2305732 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2011 | A3 | EP2305732 | 06.04.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | EP06749145 | 30.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2277935 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2015 | B1 | EP2277935 | 30.05.2012 | A3 | EP2277935 | 26.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | EP06749019 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2272888 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2012 | B1 | EP2272888 | 02.03.2011 | A3 | EP2272888 | 12.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | EP06749034 | 30.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2260887 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | EP04760273 | 19.04.2004 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2233657 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2011 | A3 | EP2233657 | 29.09.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | EP06749015 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2192141 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | B1 | EP2192141 | 02.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US12065 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | EP06740272 | 30.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2192140 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2016 | B1 | EP2192140 | 02.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | EP06749073 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2159029 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2011 | A3 | EP2159029 | 03.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | EP06758239 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2156935 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2010 | A3 | EP2156935 | 24.02.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | EP06749318 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2156934 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2015 | B1 | EP2156934 | 30.11.2011 | A3 | EP2156934 | 24.02.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP06758235 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2152777 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2014 | B1 | EP2152777 | 17.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | WO2008US05799 | 06.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2147763 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | EP06740053 | 30.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2138524 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06749029 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2138523 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2011 | B1 | EP2138523 | 30.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | EP06740055 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2074174 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US15701 | 10.07.2007 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2074158 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US15704 | 10.07.2007 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1985664 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2009 | B1 | EP1985664 | 29.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | EP06736793 | 02.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1940955 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2010 | B1 | EP1940955 | 09.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1940953 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1940910 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1940909 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2009 | B1 | EP1940909 | 09.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12627 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1940908 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2010 | B1 | EP1940908 | 09.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1940907 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2011 | B1 | EP1940907 | 09.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1913085 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2008 | B1 | EP1913085 | 23.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11693 | 30.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1913057 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2010 | B1 | EP1913057 | 23.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11913 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1913056 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2009 | B1 | EP1913056 | 23.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11912 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1913055 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11911 | 30.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1913054 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2014 | B1 | EP1913054 | 23.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US12268 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1913053 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2009 | B1 | EP1913053 | 23.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12063 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1913052 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11970 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1913051 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2010 | B1 | EP1913051 | 23.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US12065 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1910466 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2008 | B1 | EP1910466 | 16.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US12074 | 30.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1910442 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2010 | B1 | EP1910442 | 16.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US12062 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1910441 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2010 | B1 | EP1910441 | 16.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US12075 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1907443 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11966 | 30.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1907442 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2011 | B9 | EP1907442 | 17.11.2010 | B1 | EP1907442 | 09.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11937 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1907441 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11927 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1907440 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2009 | B1 | EP1907440 | 09.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11926 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1907439 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2010 | B1 | EP1907439 | 09.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12066 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1907181 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US12660 | 30.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1904551 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US11914 | 30.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1904550 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2011 | B1 | EP1904550 | 02.04.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11968 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1904549 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2009 | B1 | EP1904549 | 02.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11967 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1901871 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2008 | B1 | EP1901871 | 26.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US11928 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1899401 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2016 | B1 | EP1899401 | 19.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11962 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1899400 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2009 | B1 | EP1899400 | 19.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11662 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1899399 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2009 | B1 | EP1899399 | 19.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11660 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1898972 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2010 | B1 | EP1898972 | 19.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11700 | 30.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1891158 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2008 | B1 | EP1891158 | 27.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11909 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1891157 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2009 | B1 | EP1891157 | 27.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11891 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1891137 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2011 | B1 | EP1891137 | 27.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11910 | 30.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1891136 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2010 | B1 | EP1891136 | 27.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11893 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1891135 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2009 | B1 | EP1891135 | 27.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11873 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1891134 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11940 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1891133 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11935 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1891132 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11594 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1891131 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2015 | B1 | EP1891131 | 27.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11915 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1877488 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2015 | B1 | EP1877488 | 16.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07532 | 02.03.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1871837 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2011 | B1 | EP1871837 | 02.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07489 | 02.03.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1871595 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07439 | 02.03.2006 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1869122 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2009 | B1 | EP1869122 | 26.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07531 | 02.03.2006 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1861245 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2014 | B1 | EP1861245 | 05.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07535 | 02.03.2006 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1631351 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42661303 | 29.04.2003 | WO2004US11924 | 19.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006262856 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2011 | A8 | AU2006262856 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US12065 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006262854 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US12062 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006262852 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11968 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1891138 | Global Dossier | 23.09.2009 | B1 | EP1891138 | 27.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11890 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE411359T | 15.10.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE411360T | 15.10.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE411361T | 15.10.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE413938T | 15.11.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE434009T | 15.07.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11873 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE434020T | 15.07.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11891 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE443095T | 15.10.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11967 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE443728T | 15.10.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11890 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE444325T | 15.10.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11662 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE444326T | 15.10.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11926 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE444981T | 15.10.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12627 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE445659T | 15.10.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12063 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE446341T | 15.11.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE449121T | 15.12.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11660 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE449134T | 15.12.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07531 | 02.03.2006 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE452925T | 15.01.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11912 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE457754T | 15.03.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11700 | 30.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE458772T | 15.03.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US12065 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE461956T | 15.04.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US12075 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE466039T | 15.05.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11893 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE466898T | 15.05.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US12062 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE475683T | 15.08.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12066 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE486904T | 15.11.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE486909T | 15.11.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE488541T | 15.12.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11937 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE491737T | 15.01.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11913 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE495211T | 15.01.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11968 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE502068T | 15.04.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11910 | 30.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE505500T | 15.04.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE527315T | 15.10.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07489 | 02.03.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0611900 | 06.09.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US12268 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0613645 | 16.11.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11915 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0613698 | 16.11.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11910 | 30.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0617940 | 30.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0617941 | 30.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0617960 | 09.08.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0618017 | 16.08.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0717755 | 12.03.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US15701 | 10.07.2007 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0717761 | 12.03.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US15704 | 10.07.2007 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2524050 | 11.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42661303 | 29.04.2003 | WO2004US11924 | 19.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2598196 | 07.08.2012 | C | CA2598196 | 08.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07535 | 02.03.2006 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2598563 | 10.05.2011 | C | CA2598563 | 08.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07489 | 02.03.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2601309 | 05.07.2011 | C | CA2601309 | 08.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07532 | 02.03.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2601925 | 14.06.2011 | C | CA2601925 | 08.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07439 | 02.03.2006 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2601928 | 02.11.2010 | C | CA2601928 | 08.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07531 | 02.03.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2625671 | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2625817 | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2625823 | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2625842 | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2625846 | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2666571 | 02.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US15701 | 10.07.2007 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2666585 | 02.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US15704 | 10.07.2007 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101132909B | 23.02.2011 | B | CN101132909 | 27.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07535 | 02.03.2006 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101132910B | 30.04.2014 | B | CN101132910 | 27.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07439 | 02.03.2006 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101133122B | 16.11.2011 | B | CN101133122 | 27.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07531 | 02.03.2006 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101133123B | 28.09.2011 | B | CN101133123 | 27.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07532 | 02.03.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101133124 | 27.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193668 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193721 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193733 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193932B | 08.08.2012 | B | CN101193932 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11915 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193933B | 04.07.2012 | B | CN101193933 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11962 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193934 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193935B | 02.01.2013 | B | CN101193935 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11660 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193936B | 23.04.2014 | B | CN101193936 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US12268 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193937B | 25.04.2012 | B | CN101193937 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11937 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193938 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193939 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193940 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193941 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193942B | 05.09.2012 | B | CN101193942 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US12062 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193943B | 05.09.2012 | B | CN101193943 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US12065 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193944 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193945 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193946 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193977 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193978 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193979 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101193980 | 04.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101203540 | 18.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101203541B | 10.10.2012 | B | CN101203541 | 18.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11910 | 30.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101203542 | 18.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101203543B | 01.02.2012 | B | CN101203543 | 18.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11890 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101203544B | 17.07.2013 | B | CN101203544 | 18.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12063 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101213239 | 02.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101296965 | 29.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101296966 | 29.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101296992B | 07.08.2013 | B | CN101296992 | 29.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101300285B | 21.11.2012 | B | CN101300285 | 05.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101346427 | 14.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101528850 | 09.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101679619B | 25.04.2012 | B | CN101679619 | 24.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | WO2008US05799 | 06.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103351583B | 28.08.2018 | B | CN103351583 | 16.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200680040181 | 27.10.2006 | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006003215D1 | 27.11.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11909 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006003229D1 | 27.11.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12074 | 30.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006003230D1 | 27.11.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11693 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006003663D1 | 24.12.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US11928 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006007345D1 | 30.07.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11873 | 30.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006007346D1 | 30.07.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11891 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006009268D1 | 29.10.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11967 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006009396D1 | 05.11.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11890 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006009514D1 | 12.11.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11662 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006009519D1 | 12.11.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11926 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006009691D1 | 19.11.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12627 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006009816D1 | 26.11.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12063 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006009971D1 | 03.12.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006010528D1 | 31.12.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US07531 | 02.03.2006 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US65774705 | 02.03.2005 | US65774605 | 02.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006010552D1 | 31.12.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11660 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006011332D1 | 04.02.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11912 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006012319D1 | 01.04.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11700 | 30.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006012496D1 | 08.04.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US12065 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006013146D1 | 06.05.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US12075 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006013971D1 | 10.06.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11893 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006014160D1 | 17.06.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US12062 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006015813D1 | 09.09.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US12066 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006018045D1 | 16.12.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006018046D1 | 16.12.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006018314D1 | 30.12.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11937 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006018945D1 | 27.01.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11913 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006019597D1 | 24.02.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11968 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006020720D1 | 28.04.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11910 | 30.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006021333D1 | 26.05.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2341482T | 21.06.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11700 | 30.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1115396 | 28.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US12075 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1115398 | 28.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US12065 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1115404 | 28.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US12074 | 30.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1115405 | 28.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | WO2006US11693 | 30.03.2006 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1116727 | 02.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | WO2006US11928 | 30.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1116810 | 02.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11890 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1116815 | 02.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11909 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US36337406 | 27.02.2006 | US36337506 | 27.02.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US36341806 | 27.02.2006 | US36341706 | 27.02.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US36348106 | 27.02.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1118843 | 20.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US11660 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1120531 | 03.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007015662 | 20.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11910 | 30.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007015663 | 20.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11913 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007015664 | 20.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11915 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007015667 | 20.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11890 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007015687 | 21.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US12268 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2008005531 | 17.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009003369 | 14.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US15704 | 10.07.2007 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009003375 | 14.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US15701 | 10.07.2007 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY146045 | 15.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY146987 | 15.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1891131T | 29.04.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11915 | 30.03.2006 | EP06749020 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1891138T | 31.03.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP06758235 | 30.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | WO2006US11890 | 30.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1907442T | 29.04.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | WO2006US11937 | 30.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | EP06749034 | 30.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1940907T | 30.09.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | EP06836651 | 27.10.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1940908T | 29.04.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | EP06827057 | 27.10.2006 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1940955T | 29.04.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | EP06826819 | 27.10.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2152777T | 28.11.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | EP08767590 | 06.05.2008 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | WO2008US05799 | 06.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200706596 | 16.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US68485405 | 26.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200708562 | 01.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US68481305 | 26.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200804454 | 16.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200804457 | 16.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US39149506 | 28.03.2006 | US39088306 | 28.03.2006 | US39067206 | 28.03.2006 | US39063006 | 28.03.2006 | US39072206 | 28.03.2006 | US39080906 | 28.03.2006 | US39082606 | 28.03.2006 | US39065506 | 28.03.2006 | US39112506 | 28.03.2006 | US39086406 | 28.03.2006 | US39084706 | 28.03.2006 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | US39090806 | 28.03.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US78659806 | 28.03.2006 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | US39157106 | 28.03.2006 | US78659606 | 28.03.2006 | US39075106 | 28.03.2006 | US39085306 | 28.03.2006 | US78657106 | 28.03.2006 | US39081106 | 28.03.2006 | US39079306 | 28.03.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US39083606 | 28.03.2006 | US39088206 | 28.03.2006 | US39095506 | 28.03.2006 | US39067106 | 28.03.2006 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US78654706 | 28.03.2006 | US39156506 | 28.03.2006 | US39082706 | 28.03.2006 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US39112406 | 28.03.2006 | US39065406 | 28.03.2006 | US39063106 | 28.03.2006 | US39086506 | 28.03.2006 | US39164206 | 28.03.2006 | US39084606 | 28.03.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | US39148506 | 28.03.2006 | US39165906 | 28.03.2006 | US39075206 | 28.03.2006 | US39113706 | 28.03.2006 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | US39106306 | 28.03.2006 | US39157606 | 28.03.2006 | US39150506 | 28.03.2006 | US39075006 | 28.03.2006 | US78657206 | 28.03.2006 | US39081206 | 28.03.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | US39079406 | 28.03.2006 | US39077306 | 28.03.2006 | US39081406 | 28.03.2006 | US39115606 | 28.03.2006 | US39056306 | 28.03.2006 | US39085806 | 28.03.2006 | US39062906 | 28.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200819496 | 01.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200819497 | 01.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US58888306 | 27.10.2006 | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | WO2006US42069 | 27.10.2006 | US58890606 | 27.10.2006 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | US70647607 | 14.02.2007 | US58890706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42291 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42292 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US42293 | 27.10.2006 | WO2007US11150 | 09.05.2007 | WO2007US10590 | 02.05.2007 | US70679107 | 14.02.2007 | WO2007US10551 | 02.05.2007 | US58855406 | 27.10.2006 | US58845806 | 27.10.2006 | US58852706 | 27.10.2006 | WO2006US41917 | 27.10.2006 | US58852406 | 27.10.2006 | US63543306 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07532 | 27.03.2007 | US63543406 | 07.12.2006 | WO2007US07632 | 27.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI449726B | 21.08.2014 | B | TW200906901 | 16.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US77327507 | 03.07.2007 | US91731607 | 10.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001575 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2007 | A8 | WO2007001575 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001573 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2008 | A8 | WO2007001573 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001572 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001571 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001570 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001569 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001568 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2007 | A8 | WO2007001568 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001567 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001566 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2007 | A8 | WO2007001566 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001565 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001564 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A8 | WO2007001564 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001563 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001562 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2007 | A8 | WO2007001562 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001560 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2007 | A8 | WO2007001560 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001559 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001557 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A8 | WO2007001557 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001556 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A8 | WO2007001556 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001555 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001554 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001553 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001552 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001550 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A8 | WO2007001550 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001549 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2007 | A8 | WO2007001549 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001548 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001547 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001545 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001544 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001542 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001541 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001537 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2007 | A8 | WO2007001537 | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001536 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001535 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001533 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001532 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001531 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001530 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001529 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007001528 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006137954 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080031672 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080019218 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080019217 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080019216 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080018998 | Global Dossier | 29.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080016841 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101274908B | Global Dossier | 14.06.2013 | B1 | KR20080016839 | 22.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5795615B | Global Dossier | 14.10.2015 | B2 | JP2014051666 | 20.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5647311B | Global Dossier | 24.12.2014 | B2 | JP2014012849 | 23.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5767671B | Global Dossier | 19.08.2015 | B2 | JP2013237856 | 28.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013100557 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5685240B | Global Dossier | 18.03.2015 | B2 | JP2013100505 | 23.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5773966B | Global Dossier | 02.09.2015 | B2 | JP2013040341 | 28.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5437424B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2014 | B2 | JP2012136709 | 19.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5437425B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2014 | B2 | JP2012111969 | 14.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR055897 | 12.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE522560T | 15.09.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103755930 | 30.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY145986 | 31.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY148507 | 30.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200700454 | 01.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200700455 | 01.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200700456 | 01.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200700493 | 01.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200700494 | 01.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200700495 | 01.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200700496 | 01.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200700497 | 01.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200700498 | 01.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US75054705 | 15.12.2005 | US73905805 | 22.11.2005 | US73886905 | 22.11.2005 | US69156705 | 17.06.2005 | US75069305 | 15.12.2005 | US75068205 | 15.12.2005 | US75069205 | 15.12.2005 | US73145405 | 28.10.2005 | US73138905 | 28.10.2005 | Type | Divisional application | EP2156934 | EP2907640 |