EP1891138 - POLYESTER COMPOSITIONS WHICH COMPRISE CYCLOBUTANEDIOL HAVING CERTAIN CIS/TRANS RATIOS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [2009/39] |
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAWFORD, Emmett, Dudley 3818 Woodleaf Lane Kingsport, Tennessee 37663 / US | 02 /
PORTER, David, Scott 365 Glasgow Lane Blountville, Tennessee 37617 / US | 03 /
CONNELL, Gary, Wayne 212 Gilda Avenue Church Hill, Tennessee 37642 / US | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06758235.3 | 30.03.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006US11890 | Priority number, date | US20050691567P | 17.06.2005 Original published format: US 691567 P | US20050731389P | 28.10.2005 Original published format: US 731389 P | US20050731454P | 28.10.2005 Original published format: US 731454 P | US20050738869P | 22.11.2005 Original published format: US 738869 P | US20050739058P | 22.11.2005 Original published format: US 739058 P | US20050750547P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 750547 P | US20050750682P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 750682 P | US20050750692P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 750692 P | US20050750693P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 750693 P | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007001547 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1891138 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1891138 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/199, C08L67/02 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
A01G9/1438 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
A47F5/00 (EP,US);
B01D61/30 (EP,US);
B32B17/10018 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B65D1/0207 (EP,US);
B65D23/10 (EP,US);
B65D25/00 (EP,US);
B65D43/00 (EP,US);
C08G63/183 (KR,US);
C08G63/199 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (US);
C08J7/123 (EP,US);
C08K3/32 (EP,US);
C08K5/521 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/03 (KR);
C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C09D167/02 (US);
E01F8/0005 (EP,US);
E04D13/03 (EP,US);
G02B1/04 (KR);
G02B1/14 (EP,US);
G02F1/133606 (EP,US);
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
B29C49/00 (EP,US);
B29C49/0005 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7542 (EP,US);
C08J2367/00 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
C08J2483/00 (EP,US);
C08K2201/014 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
G02B1/10 (EP,US);
G02B5/3083 (EP,US);
Y02A40/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1397 (EP,US);
Y10T428/161 (EP,US);
Y10T428/162 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24107 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/32, C08L67/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/521, C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/18 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYESTERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE CYCLOBUTANDIOL MIT BESTIMMTEN CIS/TRANS-VERHÄLTNISSEN ENTHALTEN | [2008/09] | English: | POLYESTER COMPOSITIONS WHICH COMPRISE CYCLOBUTANEDIOL HAVING CERTAIN CIS/TRANS RATIOS | [2008/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE POLYESTER COMPRENANT DU CYCLOBUTANEDIOL AVEC DES RAPPORTS CIS/TRANS DETERMINES | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 03.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09012051.0 / EP2156934 | EP15000775.5 / EP2907640 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.09.2009 | BE | 23.09.2009 | BG | 23.09.2009 | CY | 23.09.2009 | CZ | 23.09.2009 | DK | 23.09.2009 | EE | 23.09.2009 | FI | 23.09.2009 | LT | 23.09.2009 | LV | 23.09.2009 | NL | 23.09.2009 | RO | 23.09.2009 | SE | 23.09.2009 | SI | 23.09.2009 | SK | 23.09.2009 | TR | 23.09.2009 | GR | 24.12.2009 | ES | 03.01.2010 | IS | 23.01.2010 | PT | 25.01.2010 | HU | 24.03.2010 | IE | 30.03.2010 | LU | 30.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
BG | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
IS | 23.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
HU | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 30.03.2010 | ||
LU | 30.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
BG | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
IS | 23.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
HU | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 30.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
BG | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
IS | 23.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
IE | 30.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
IS | 23.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
IE | 30.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
IS | 23.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
IE | 30.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
GR | 24.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
IS | 23.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
DK | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
IS | 23.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
NL | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
IS | 23.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 23.09.2009 | |
BE | 23.09.2009 | ||
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
IS | 23.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 23.09.2009 | |
CY | 23.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
IS | 23.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
CZ | 23.09.2009 | ||
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
RO | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
SK | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
IS | 23.01.2010 | ||
PT | 25.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
EE | 23.09.2009 | ||
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
ES | 03.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 23.09.2009 | |
FI | 23.09.2009 | ||
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | FI | 23.09.2009 | |
LT | 23.09.2009 | ||
LV | 23.09.2009 | ||
SE | 23.09.2009 | ||
SI | 23.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1278284 (KODAK PATHE); | [A]GB1044015 (KODAK LTD); | [A]UST875010I ; | [A]US5705575 (KELSEY DONALD ROSS [US]); | [A]US5942585 (SCOTT CHRISTOPHER E [US], et al); | [A]US6011124 (SCOTT CHRISTOPHER EDWARD [US], et al); | [A]US6043322 (SCOTT CHRISTOPHER EDWARD [US], et al); | [A]US6096854 (MORRIS JOHN C [US], et al); | [A]US6120889 (TURNER S RICHARD [US], et al) |