EP1938967 - solar cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/27] | BACK SHEET OF SOLAR CELL | ||
[2013/15] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIJI, Kazuhiro@c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, OSAKA 5668585 / JP | 02 /
NAGATO, Masaru, @c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 5668585 / JP | 03 /
HIGUCHI, Tatsuya@c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 5668585 / JP | 04 /
KATO, Masami, @c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 5668585 / JP | [2013/31] |
Former [2008/39] | 01 /
MEIJI, Kazuhiro c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, OSAKA 5668585 / JP | ||
02 /
NAGATO, Masaru, c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 5668585 / JP | |||
03 /
HIGUCHI, Tatsuya c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 5668585 / JP | |||
04 /
KATO, Masami, c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 5668585 / JP | |||
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
HIGUCHI, Tatsuya, c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, OSAKA 5668585 / JP | ||
02 /
NAGATO, Masaru, c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 5668585 / JP | |||
03 /
MEIJI, Kazuhiro, c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 5668585 / JP | |||
04 /
KATO, Masami, c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 5668585 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/03] |
Former [2013/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/27] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06767159.4 | 22.06.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006JP312501 | Priority number, date | JP20050212550 | 22.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005212550 | [2008/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007010706 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1938967 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1938967 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1938967 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/30, H01L31/042 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
H01L31/049 (EP);
H01L31/048 (CN);
B32B17/10018 (EP,CN);
B32B17/10788 (EP,CN);
C09D127/18 (EP,CN);
B32B2367/00 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/03] |
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | solarzelle | [2013/15] | English: | solar cell | [2013/15] | French: | cellule solaire | [2013/15] |
Former [2008/27] | RÜCKENSCHICHT FÜR SOLARZELLE | ||
Former [2008/27] | BACK SHEET OF SOLAR CELL | ||
Former [2008/27] | FEUILLE ARRIÈRE DE CELLULE SOLAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2008 | Translation filed | 27.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 28.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2010 | Observations by third parties | 04.08.2011 | Observations by third parties | 04.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11180177.5 / EP2418082 | EP14154101.1 / EP2730406 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.04.2014
13.05.2014
ADMISSIBLE ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP Opponent's representative Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/21] |
Former [2014/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.04.2014
13.05.2014
ADMISSIBLE ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP Opponent's representative Hock, Joachim Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.04.2014
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 06.06.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.12.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.04.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.04.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.05.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.12.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 27.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 27.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 27.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 27.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 27.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2006 | BE | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | LT | 31.07.2013 | LV | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | NL | 31.07.2013 | PL | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SE | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | IS | 30.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | GB | 22.06.2014 | IE | 22.06.2014 | LU | 22.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.06.2006 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
GB | 22.06.2014 | ||
IE | 22.06.2014 | ||
LU | 22.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
GB | 22.06.2014 | ||
IE | 22.06.2014 | ||
LU | 22.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
GB | 22.06.2014 | ||
IE | 22.06.2014 | ||
LU | 22.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
IE | 22.06.2014 | ||
LU | 22.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | BE | 31.07.2013 | |
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 31.07.2013 | |
PT | 02.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002026343 ; | [A]US6369316 (PLESSING ALBERT [AT], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 37 - line 52 * * column 1, line 58 - line 64 * * column 2, line 6 - line 9 * * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 27 * * claims 1,2,6,11 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 30, Database accession no. 2002-257217, XP002522001 & JP2002026343 A 20020125 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | other | JPS6392064 | JPH06350117 | JPH08330618 | JPH10156993 | JPH10284745 | JP2000114565 | JP2000138388 | JP2000141531 | JP2000307137 | JP2004137408 | JP2004300319 | JP2004307666 | JP2004352966 |