|
17.05.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
13.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2008 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.10.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
13 |