15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
27.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
19.12.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
19.12.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
12.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
22.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
18.07.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
10.01.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
13.12.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
18.11.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.11.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.10.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
30.08.2013 |
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
17.07.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.06.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
28.06.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.02.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
07.12.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] |
05.12.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2009 |
Change - name/address |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
27.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.03.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.12.2008 |
First examination report |
|
02.12.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.10.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
29.08.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
25.07.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
04.07.2008 |
Change - inventor |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
21.05.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
07.03.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
01.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|