Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101293511B | Global Dossier | 06.08.2013 | B1 | KR20080009207 | 25.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US13371905 | 20.05.2005 | WO2006US18511 | 12.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5247433B | Global Dossier | 24.07.2013 | B2 | JP2008541667 | 20.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US13371905 | 20.05.2005 | WO2006US18511 | 12.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1908320 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2014 | B1 | EP1908320 | 09.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13371905 | 20.05.2005 | WO2006US18511 | 12.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101180908B | 12.12.2012 | B | CN101180908 | 14.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US13371905 | 20.05.2005 | WO2006US18511 | 12.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006127302 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13371905 | 20.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7751855 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2010 | B2 | US2006281458 | 14.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13371905 | 20.05.2005 |