EP1908320 - PRIVATE ROUTING CONTROL NUMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/03] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. 600-700 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | ||
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAI, Yigang 23643 Royal Worthington Drive Naperville, Will IL 60564 / US | [2008/32] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
CAI, Yigang 1919 Nutmeg Circle Naperville, IL 60565 / US | Representative(s) | Wetzel, Emmanuelle Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property Business Group 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Wetzel, Emmanuelle Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2013/02] | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Merianstrasse 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2008/15] | Sarup, David Alexander Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06770293.6 | 12.05.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006US18511 | Priority number, date | US20050133719 | 20.05.2005 Original published format: US 133719 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006127302 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908320 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1908320 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/16, H04M3/42, H04M3/436, // H04W8/18 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
H04W4/16 (EP,US);
H04W8/24 (KR);
H04M1/57 (KR);
H04M3/42 (KR);
H04M3/42102 (EP,US);
H04M3/436 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/24, H04Q7/22, H04M3/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | PRIVAT-ROUTING-STEUERNUMMERN | [2008/15] | English: | PRIVATE ROUTING CONTROL NUMBERS | [2008/15] | French: | NUMEROS DE COMMANDE D'ACHEMINEMENT PRIVES | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2006 | AT | 12.02.2014 | BE | 12.02.2014 | BG | 12.02.2014 | CY | 12.02.2014 | CZ | 12.02.2014 | DK | 12.02.2014 | EE | 12.02.2014 | ES | 12.02.2014 | FI | 12.02.2014 | IT | 12.02.2014 | LT | 12.02.2014 | LV | 12.02.2014 | MC | 12.02.2014 | NL | 12.02.2014 | PL | 12.02.2014 | RO | 12.02.2014 | SE | 12.02.2014 | SI | 12.02.2014 | SK | 12.02.2014 | TR | 12.02.2014 | IE | 12.05.2014 | LU | 12.05.2014 | GR | 13.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | IS | 12.06.2014 | PT | 12.06.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.05.2006 | |
AT | 12.02.2014 | ||
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
IE | 12.05.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.02.2014 | |
IS | 12.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6671523 (NIEPEL ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 10 * * column 5, line 40 - line 59 *; | [XA]WO9842115 (FINLAND TELECOM OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,8-10 * abstract * * page 2, lines 3-28 * * page 4, line 13 - line 29 * * page 5, line 20 - line 25 * * page 6, line 1 - line 24 * * claim 1 * [A] 2-8; | [A]WO0039988 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 3,4 * abstract * * page 10, line 3 - page 11, line 3 * * claims 1,6 * * figures 2a,2b,3a,4,5 *; | [A]WO9831163 (TANDEM COMPUTERS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 21 * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 4 * * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 12 * * figures 2-4 * | [X] - 3GPP, "IP Multimedia Subsystem (IMS)", 3GPP TS 23.228 V6.9.0, (200503), pages 1,24-27, 30,31,38,39,81-83 - 89-91, XP002400000 [X] 1-10 * pages 24-27 chapter 4.3.3 * * figures 4.5, 4.6 * * pages 30-31 chapter 4.6.3 * * pages 38-39 chapter 5.2.1a.0 * * figure 5.0c * * pages 81-83 chapter 5.6.3 * * figure 5.16 * * pages 89-91 chapter 5.7.2 * * figure 5.18 * |