EP1907527 - DEVICE FOR PREPARING A BODY FLUID FOR A BACTERIOLOGICAL ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson Infusion Therapy Systems Inc. 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [2016/29] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Hemosystem 45, cours Gouffe 13006 Marseille / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESSON-FAURE, Isabelle Villa les Troënes Promenade Pierre Blancard F-13400 Aubagne / FR | 02 /
HERMET, Jean-Pierre 4ter, avenue Charles de Gaulle F-92100 Boulogne / FR | 03 /
RIBAULT, Sébastien 10, rue du Canal 67380 Lingolsheim / FR | [2016/05] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
BESSON-FAURE, Isabelle Villa les Troënes, Promenade Pierre Blancard F-13400 Aubagne / FR | ||
02 /
HERMET, Jean-Pierre 4ter, avenue Charles de Gaulle F-92100 Boulogne / FR | |||
03 /
RIBAULT, Sébastien 10, rue du Canal 67380 Lingolsheim / FR | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Helbing, Jörg, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 06778860.4 | 11.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006FR01690 | Priority number, date | FR20050052151 | 12.07.2005 Original published format: FR 0552151 | [2008/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007006972 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1907527 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1907527 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/34, C12M1/12 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
B01L3/5021 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0633 (EP,US);
B01L2400/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/05] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR PRÄPARATION EINER KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEIT FÜR EINE BAKTERIOLOGISCHE ANALYSE | [2008/15] | English: | DEVICE FOR PREPARING A BODY FLUID FOR A BACTERIOLOGICAL ANALYSIS | [2008/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PREPARATION D'UN ECHANTILLON DE FLUIDE BIOLOGIQUE EN VUE D'UNE ANALYSE BACTERIOLOGIQUE | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 04.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 03.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.07.2006 | AT | 03.02.2016 | CY | 03.02.2016 | CZ | 03.02.2016 | DK | 03.02.2016 | EE | 03.02.2016 | FI | 03.02.2016 | LT | 03.02.2016 | LV | 03.02.2016 | MC | 03.02.2016 | NL | 03.02.2016 | PL | 03.02.2016 | RO | 03.02.2016 | SE | 03.02.2016 | SI | 03.02.2016 | SK | 03.02.2016 | TR | 03.02.2016 | BG | 03.05.2016 | GR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 03.06.2016 | PT | 03.06.2016 | IE | 11.07.2016 | LU | 11.07.2016 | BE | 31.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.07.2006 | |
AT | 03.02.2016 | ||
CY | 03.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
IE | 11.07.2016 | ||
LU | 11.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
IE | 11.07.2016 | ||
LU | 11.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
MC | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SI | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
BG | 03.05.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
CZ | 03.02.2016 | ||
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
RO | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
SK | 03.02.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
EE | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
DK | 03.02.2016 | ||
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
LV | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
SE | 03.02.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 03.02.2016 | |
FI | 03.02.2016 | ||
LT | 03.02.2016 | ||
NL | 03.02.2016 | ||
PL | 03.02.2016 | ||
GR | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 03.02.2016 | |
GR | 04.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9504098 (HENKEL CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 13 - page 2, line 10 *; | [A]WO9502050 (TEPNEL MEDICAL LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 9 - page 5, line 18 *; | [AD]US6869769 (BURGOYNE LEIGH ALEXANDER [AU]) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 10 - line 68 *; | [A]EP0122581 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]WO0132828 (PALL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * claims 1,28 *; | [A]FR2853326 (BIOMERIEUX SA [FR]) [A] 1,10 * claims 1,7 * | Examination | US5858253 | by applicant | US6869769 | US5958257 |