EP1928413 - HFSH AQUEOUS FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Life Sciences Ltd. LG Twin Tower, East Tower, 20 Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Suk Young 103-612 Songgang Chungsol Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-752 / KR | 02 /
JEH, Hoon Sung 11-402 KIT Gyosu Apt. Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-350 / KR | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06798894.9 | 25.09.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006KR03811 | Priority number, date | KR20050089853 | 27.09.2005 Original published format: KR 20050089853 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007037607 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1928413 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1928413 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, // A61K47/02, A61K47/10, A61K47/26, A61K47/18 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (KR,US);
A61K47/26 (US);
A61K38/24 (KR,US);
A61K47/02 (US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/16 (US);
A61K47/20 (US);
A61K47/24 (US);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/06 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/24] | A61K9/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Extension states | AL | 19.03.2008 | BA | 19.03.2008 | HR | 19.03.2008 | MK | 19.03.2008 | RS | 19.03.2008 | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE HFSH-FORMULIERUNG | [2008/24] | English: | HFSH AQUEOUS FORMULATION | [2008/24] | French: | FORMULATION AQUEUSE DE hFSH | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 19.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 20.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.01.2011
24.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Shigeo Akiyama 22-4 Higashikori-shinmachi Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-0077 / JP Opponent's representative dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | 02
03.02.2011
25.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ferring B.V. Polaris Ave 144 2132JX Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.01.2011
24.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Shigeo Akiyama 22-4 Higashikori-shinmachi Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-0077 / JP Opponent's representative von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
02
03.02.2011
25.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ferring B.V. Polaris Ave 144 2132JX Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2011/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.01.2011
Shigeo Akiyama 22-4 Higashikori-shinmachi Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-0077 / JP Opponent's representative Weber, Thomas, et al, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
02
03.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ferring B.V. Polaris Ave 144 2132JX Hoofddorp / NL Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2011/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.01.2011
Shigeo Akiyama 22-4 Higashikori-shinmachi Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-0077 / JP Opponent's representative Weber, Thomas, et al, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | 29.04.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.08.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.09.2012 | 04.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.09.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/04] | 18.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.05.2010 | BE | 05.05.2010 | CH | 05.05.2010 | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | IT | 05.05.2010 | LI | 05.05.2010 | LT | 05.05.2010 | LV | 05.05.2010 | PL | 05.05.2010 | RO | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | CY | 26.05.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | IS | 05.09.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | IE | 25.09.2010 | LU | 25.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | HU | 06.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.05.2010 | ||
CH | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
IE | 25.09.2010 | ||
LU | 25.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
IE | 25.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004087213 (ARES TRADING SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-10* claims 1,26,30,31 * | International search | [A]US5929028 (SKRABANJA ARNOLD TITUS PHILIP [NL], et al); | [A]WO0004913 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al); | [A]WO03039485 (PROTEIN DESIGN LABS [US], et al); | [A]US2004028733 (TRACY MARK A [US], et al) |