Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1910736
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.01.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
27.09.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.02.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.02.2011 |
First examination report |
|
29.12.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.04.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
23.04.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
31.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
14.03.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
11.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|