Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8393777 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2013 | B2 | US2009167651 | 02.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99714306 | 28.07.2006 | WO2006US29671 | 28.07.2006 | US70364405 | 28.07.2005 | US72918805 | 21.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009503793 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US29671 | 28.07.2006 | US70364405 | 28.07.2005 | US72918805 | 21.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1910736 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2010 | A4 | EP1910736 | 16.04.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US29671 | 28.07.2006 | US70364405 | 28.07.2005 | US72918805 | 21.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101228391B | 29.09.2010 | B | CN101228391 | 23.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US29671 | 28.07.2006 | US70364405 | 28.07.2005 | US72918805 | 21.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007014371 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2007 | A3 | WO2007014371 | 01.02.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70364405 | 28.07.2005 | US72918805 | 21.10.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20080036213 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US70364405 | 28.07.2005 | US72918805 | 21.10.2005 |