EP1910736 - ETENDUE-CONSERVING ILLUMINATION-OPTICS FOR BACKLIGHTS AND FRONTLIGHTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Light Prescriptions Innovators, LLC. 2400 Lincoln Avenue Altadena, CA 91001 / US | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINANO, Juan Carlos Calle Santa Cruz de Marcenado 317 E-28015 Madrid / ES | 02 /
BENITEZ, Pablo Calle Canon del Rio, Lobos 11 3 B 28030 Madrid / ES | 03 /
CHAVES, Julio Marques de Urquijo 14, 5 D E-28040 Madrid / ES | 04 /
FALICOFF, Waqidi 1168 Campanile Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | 05 /
PARKYN, William, A., Jr. 25031 Neko Drive Lomita, CA 90717 / US | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Siegert, Georg Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Siegert, Georg Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06800531.3 | 28.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006US29671 | Priority number, date | US20050703644P | 28.07.2005 Original published format: US 703644 P | US20050729188P | 21.10.2005 Original published format: US 729188 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007014371 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1910736 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/04, G02B6/00 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
G02B6/0028 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
F21V7/04 (KR);
G02B6/0048 (EP,US);
G02B6/0078 (EP,US);
G02B6/0018 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/16] | F21V7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BANDBREITENBEWAHRENDE BELEUCHTUNGSOPTIK FÜR RÜCK- UND VORDERLEUCHTEN | [2008/16] | English: | ETENDUE-CONSERVING ILLUMINATION-OPTICS FOR BACKLIGHTS AND FRONTLIGHTS | [2008/16] | French: | OPTIQUE D'ECLAIRAGE A CONSERVATION D'ETENDUE POUR SYSTEMES D'ECLAIRAGE PAR L'ARRIERE ET D'ECLAIRAGE PAR L'AVANT | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 19.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | 04.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2552278 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [A] 1 * pages 13-14; figures 3-4 *; | [A]US5005108 (PRISTASH DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5434754 (LI JOHN X [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0962694 (CITIZEN ELECTRONICS [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2003147232 (KRAFT EDWARD ROBERT [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP1434277 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]US7001058 (INDITSKY BEN-ZION [IL]); | [A]US6871982 (HOLMAN ROBERT L [US], et al) |