10.03.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
09.08.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
15.07.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
01.04.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
22.03.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.03.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.01.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.10.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.11.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
17.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.04.2010 |
First examination report |
|
20.04.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.08.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |
03.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
19.09.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
17.09.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
31.05.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.05.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
30.05.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
08.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.04.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|