EP1937538 - LOCATOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNA INTERNATIONAL INC 337 Magna Drive Aurora Ontario L4G 7K1 / CA | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPADIA, Ameil, A. 7352 Needle Point Drive Shelby, MI 48316 / US | 02 /
SCHALTE, Gari, M. 4079 Wincrest Lane Oakland Township, MI 48306 / US | 03 /
PILETTE, Thomas 3684 High Grove Lake Orion, MI 48360 / US | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/43] | Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Hössle, Markus Hössle Kudlek & Partner Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/27] | Hössle, Markus Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 23 38 D-70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06816117.3 | 29.09.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006US38630 | Priority number, date | US20050722273P | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 722273 P | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007041583 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1937538 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937538 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62D65/00, B62D25/08, B62D27/02 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
B62D65/02 (EP,US);
B62D25/082 (EP,US);
B62D25/084 (EP,US);
B62D65/04 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49895 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/18] |
Former [2008/43] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POSITIONIERANORDNUNG | [2008/27] | English: | LOCATOR ASSEMBLY | [2008/27] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE POSITIONNEMENT | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 03.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1270387 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * paragraph [0030] * [A] 4,5,10,11,13-16; | [XA]EP1279587 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * paragraph [0025] * [A] 4,5,10,11,13-16; | [X]EP1544035 (FAURECIA BLOC AVANT [FR]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] * | by applicant | EP1270387 | EP1279587 | EP1544035 |