|
13.05.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.05.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
06.12.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
06.12.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
06.12.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.10.2007 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.10.2007 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
04.10.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
04.10.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
28.09.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
28.09.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.08.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
27 |