15.05.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
06.06.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
03.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.05.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.01.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
16.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
01.05.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.04.2012 |
First examination report |
|
17.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.11.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
15.11.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
21.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.07.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
11.07.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
25.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|