EP1955288 - COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING SAME. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2014/28] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Hiroki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2014/28] |
Former [2008/33] | 01 /
OKADA, Hiroki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2008/33] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06821030.1 | 27.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006IB03485 | Priority number, date | JP20050342092 | 28.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005342092 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007060542 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1955288 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1955288 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
H04L27/0012 (EP,US);
G07C7/00 (EP,US);
G07C9/00309 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/52] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR IHRER STEUERUNG | [2008/33] | English: | COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING SAME. | [2008/33] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION ET SON PROCEDE DE COMMANDE | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 01.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1362753 (VALEO ELECTRONIQUE SPI [FR]) [X] 4 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0049]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0065] * [Y] 2,3,6; | [XY]FR2859336 (IMRA EUROP SAS [FR]) [X] 1,5,7-12 * abstract * * page 6, line 2 - page 10, line 20; figure 1 * * page 22, line 13 - page 25, line 3; figure 4 * [Y] 2,3,6; | [A]US2005058232 (MURAKAMI YUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,4,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0003]; figure 3 ** paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025]; figure 1 * |