EP1942563 - CONNECTION MEMBER AND HARNESS CONNECTION BODY USING THE CONNECTION MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | For all designated states Furukawa Automotive Systems Inc. 1000, Amago Koura-cho Inukami-gun, Shiga-ken 522-0242 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | ||
For all designated states Furukawa Automotive Systems Inc. 1000, Amago Koura-cho Inukami-gun, Shiga-ken 522-0242 / JP | |||
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Cable Industries, Ltd. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8303 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMBO, Tsugio c/o Nerima Office MITSUBISHI CABLE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 1768516 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Michiyasu c/o Nerima Office MITSUBISHI CABLE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 1768516 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO, Tomokazu c/o Nerima Office MITSUBISHI CABLE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 1768516 / JP | 04 /
AMANO, Tatsuyuki c/o Nerima Office MITSUBISHI CABLE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 1768516 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA, Yoshikazu c/o Nerima Office MITSUBISHI CABLE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 1768516 / JP | 06 /
HIROSE, Tetsu c/o Nerima Office MITSUBISHI CABLE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 1768516 / JP | [2008/46] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
AMBO, Tsugio c/o Nerima Office, MITSUBISHI CABLE INDUSTRIES, LT D., 29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 1768516 / JP | ||
02 /
WATANABE, Michiyasu c/o Nerima Office, MITSUBISHI CABLE INDUSTRIES, LT D., 29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 1768516 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUMOTO, Tomokazu c/o Nerima Office, MITSUBISHI CABLE INDUSTRIES, LT D., 29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 1768516 / JP | |||
04 /
AMANO, Tatsuyuki c/o Nerima Office, MITSUBISHI CABLE INDUSTRIES, LT D., 29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 1768516 / JP | |||
05 /
TANAKA, Yoshikazu c/o Nerima Office, MITSUBISHI CABLE INDUSTRIES, LT D., 29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 1768516 / JP | |||
06 /
HIROSE, Tetsu c/o Nerima Office, MITSUBISHI CABLE INDUSTRIES, LT D., 29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 1768516 / JP | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06822397.3 | 26.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006JP321428 | Priority number, date | JP20050312774 | 27.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005312774 | JP20060043282 | 21.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006043282 | JP20060125490 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006125490 | JP20060144253 | 24.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006144253 | JP20060273619 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006273619 | [2008/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007049724 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1942563 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01R31/08, H01R9/24, H01R27/02, H01R31/02, H01R11/12, H01R101/00 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
H01R31/08 (EP,KR,US);
H01R27/02 (KR);
H01R11/12 (EP,US);
H01R2101/00 (EP,US);
H01R2201/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/49] | H01R31/08, H01R9/24, H01R27/02, H01R31/06, H01R11/01, H01R12/51 | ||
Former IPC [2012/17] | H01R31/08, H01R9/24, H01R27/02, H01R31/06, H01R11/01 | ||
Former IPC [2008/28] | H01R31/08, H01R9/24, H01R27/02, H01R31/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/47] |
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSGLIED UND KABELBAUM-VERBINDUNGSKÖRPER MIT DEM VERBINDUNGSGLIED | [2008/28] | English: | CONNECTION MEMBER AND HARNESS CONNECTION BODY USING THE CONNECTION MEMBER | [2008/28] | French: | ELEMENT DE CONNEXION ET CORPS DE CONNEXION DE FAISCEAUX UTILISANT CET ELEMENT | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | Translation filed | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 28.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/03] | 26.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5106318 (ENDO TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,11 * abstract * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 67 *; | [A]JPH08279382 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) [A] 1,6* abstract *; | [A]US5645456 (PETERSEN CARL C [US], et al) [A] 1,6,11 * abstract * * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 5 *; | [A]US2002155753 (YAMANASHI HIDENORI [JP]) [A] 11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0055] *; | [A]JP2005166408 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * |