|
08.03.2016 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2008 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.09.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
28.06.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
18 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |