11.03.2016 |
Refusal of application |
published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] |
04.02.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.11.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
24.11.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
21.11.2015 |
Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
12.10.2015 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
11.02.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
06.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
29.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.03.2009 |
First examination report |
|
17.03.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.10.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.10.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
10.10.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
01.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.09.2008 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.08.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.05.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|