Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1989644 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31376905 | 22.12.2005 | WO2006EP12084 | 14.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007071343 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2007 | A3 | WO2007071343 | 28.06.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31376905 | 22.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7676474 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2010 | B2 | US2007156698 | 05.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31376905 | 22.12.2005 |