EP1989644 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FINDING LOG FILES GENERATED BY A DISTRIBUTED COMPUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP SE Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2014/43] |
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEBHART, Alexander Akazienweg 17 76698 Ubstadt-Weiher / DE | 02 /
FOZAK, Erol Forststrasse 8 75175 Pforzheim / DE | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06829634.2 | 14.12.2006 | [2008/46] | WO2006EP12084 | Priority number, date | US20050313769 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: US 313769 | [2008/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007071343 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1989644 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
G06F16/156 (EP,US);
H04L67/535 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM FINDEN VON DURCH EINEN VERTEILTEN COMPUTER ERZEUGTEN PROTOKOLLIERUNGSDATEIEN | [2008/46] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FINDING LOG FILES GENERATED BY A DISTRIBUTED COMPUTER | [2008/46] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE RECHERCHE DE FICHIERS JOURNAUX PRODUITS PAR UN ORDINATEUR REPARTI | [2008/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 10.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.10.2015 | 13.10.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/15] | 13.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/15] | 25.11.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6401097 (MCCOTTER THOMAS M [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * column 1 - column 8 *; | [A]US6832220 (RAHMAN TANVIR [US]) [A] 1-22* column 1 - column 9 *; | [A]US2005160107 (LIANG PING [US]) [A] 1-22 * column 1 - column 30 *; | [X]US2005165912 (COLBECK SCOTT J [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * column 1 - column 8 * | Examination | US2005114708 | EP1566753 |