EP1952492 - ELECTRICALLY PUMPED ND3+ DOPED SOLID LASERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOURBILLEAU, Fabrice 9 Boulevard Saint Philbert F-14510 Houlgate / FR | 02 /
BREARD, David 24 rue du Stade F-14540 Soliers / FR | 03 /
RIZK, Richard 5 Allée des Florals F-14000 Caen / FR | 04 /
DOUALAN, Jean-Louis 5 sente du Manoir F-14980 Rots / FR | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Bredema 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06831149.7 | 21.11.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006FR02558 | Priority number, date | US20050738500P | 21.11.2005 Original published format: US 738500 P | [2008/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007057580 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1952492 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/063 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
H01S3/06 (EP,US);
H01S3/063 (EP,US);
H01S3/0632 (EP,US);
H01S3/09 (EP,US);
H01S3/1603 (EP,US);
H01S3/1611 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH GEPUMPTE ND3+-DOTIERTE FESTLASER | [2008/32] | English: | ELECTRICALLY PUMPED ND3+ DOPED SOLID LASERS | [2008/32] | French: | LASER SOLIDES DOPES ND3+ POMPES ELECTRIQUEMENT | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - RAN G Z ET AL, "Room-temperature 1.54 &mgr", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (20011201), vol. 90, no. 11, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 5835 - 5837, XP012053668 [X] 1,9,11,27,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1413231 | [X] - IACONA F ET AL, "Electroluminescence at 1.54 &mgr", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20021021), vol. 81, no. 17, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 3242 - 3244, XP012032279 [X] 1,9,11,27,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1516235 | [X] - SUN J M ET AL, "On the mechanism of electroluminescence excitation in Er-doped SiO2 containing silicon nanoclusters", OPTICAL MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (200502), vol. 27, no. 5, ISSN 0925-3467, pages 1050 - 1054, XP004738759 [X] 1,9,11,27,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.optmat.2004.08.061 | [X] - IRRERA A ET AL, "Correlation between electroluminescence and structural properties of Si nanoclusters", OPTICAL MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (200502), vol. 27, no. 5, ISSN 0925-3467, pages 1031 - 1040, XP004738756 [X] 1,9,11,27,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.optmat.2004.08.058 | [X] - GOURBILLEAU F ET AL, "Fabrication and optical properties of Er-doped multilayers Si-rich SiO2/SiO2: size control, optimum Er-Si coupling and interaction distance monitoring", OPTICAL MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (200502), vol. 27, no. 5, ISSN 0925-3467, pages 868 - 875, XP004738724 [X] 1,9,11,27,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.optmat.2004.08.026 | [X] - NAZAROV A ET AL, "Light emission and charge trapping in Er-doped silicon dioxide films containing silicon nanocrystals", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20050407), vol. 86, no. 15, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 151914 - 151914, XP012064994 [X] 1,9,11,27,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1872208 | [PX] - BREARD ET AL, "Nd<3+> photoluminescence study of Nd-doped Si-rich silica films obtained by reactive magnetron sputtering", JOURNAL OF LUMINESCENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200612), vol. 121, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2313, pages 209 - 212, XP005719143 [PX] 1,9,11,27,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jlumin.2006.07.023 | [PX] - NAVARRO-URRIOS ET AL, "Optical losses and gain in silicon-rich silica waveguides containing Er ions", JOURNAL OF LUMINESCENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200612), vol. 121, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2313, pages 249 - 255, XP005719153 [PX] 1,9,11,27,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jlumin.2006.08.002 | [PX] - YURTSEVER AYCAN ET AL, "Three-dimensional imaging of nonspherical silicon nanoparticles embedded in silicon oxide by plasmon tomography", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20061013), vol. 89, no. 15, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 151920 - 151920, XP012086275 [PX] 1,9,11,27,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2360906 |