18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
14.12.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
24.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
13.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
06.01.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] |
30.12.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
29.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.11.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.07.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.06.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.02.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.03.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.11.2008 |
First examination report |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.09.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
05.09.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
06.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|