Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009032465 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 | WO2006EP69401 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101409786B | Global Dossier | 03.07.2014 | B1 | KR20080089455 | 06.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 | WO2006EP69401 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5371444B | Global Dossier | 18.12.2013 | B2 | JP2009524511 | 02.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 | WO2006EP69401 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1976619 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2012 | B1 | EP1976619 | 08.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 | WO2006EP69401 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE544506T | 15.02.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 | WO2006EP69401 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0621289 | 06.12.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 | WO2006EP69401 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2640338 | 02.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 | WO2006EP69401 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101360549B | 26.09.2012 | B | CN101360549 | 04.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 | WO2006EP69401 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2380937T | 21.05.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 | WO2006EP69401 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1976619T | 31.07.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 | EP06841288 | 07.12.2006 | WO2006EP69401 | 07.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007085321 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006003618 | 02.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY150775 | 28.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI409282B | 21.09.2013 | B | TW200740864 | 01.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006003618 | 26.01.2006 |