EP1948810 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR EFFICIENT DELIVERY OF NUCLEIC ACIDS TO CELLS USING CHITOSAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polyvalor, Limited Partnership 5160 Decarie Blvd, Suite 770 Montreal, QC H3X 2H9 / CA | [2010/36] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Biosyntech Canada Inc. 475 Armand Frappier Boulevard Laval Québec H7V 4B3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSCHMANN, Michael D. 4329, Avenue King-Edward Montréal, Québec H4B 2H4 / CA | 02 /
LAVERTU, Marc 2735, Boulevard Toupin Saint-Laurent, Québec H4R 1G7 / CA | 03 /
MÉTHOT, Stéphane 3922, Rue Saint-André Montréal, Québec H2L 3W1 / CA | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | McDade, Sophie V.G.A. Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Coret, Sophie V.G.A. Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 06846908.9 | 06.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006CA01813 | Priority number, date | US20050733173P | 04.11.2005 Original published format: US 733173 P | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007059605 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1948810 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 31.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/87, A61K31/70, A61K31/715, A61K48/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/85 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
C12N15/87 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K31/715 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR EFFIZIENTEN VERABREICHUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREN IN ZELLEN MITHILFE VON CHITOSAN | [2008/31] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR EFFICIENT DELIVERY OF NUCLEIC ACIDS TO CELLS USING CHITOSAN | [2008/31] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE UTILISANT DU CHITOSAN POUR L'ADMINISTRATION EFFICACE D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES A DES CELLULES | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 15.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 09.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - MANSOURI S ET AL, "Chitosan-DNA nanoparticles as non-viral vectors in gene therapy: strategies to improve transfection efficacy", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0939-6411(03)00155-3, (20040101), vol. 57, no. 1, ISSN 0939-6411, pages 1 - 8, XP004518747 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0939-6411(03)00155-3 | International search | [X]WO9742975 ; | [X]US2003039665 ; | [X] - HUANG M. ET AL., "Uptake and cytotoxicity of chitosan molecules and nanoparticles: effects of molecular weight and degree of deacetylation", PHARM. RES., (200402), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 344 - 353, XP003013916 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:PHAM.0000016249.52831.a5 | [X] - KIANG T. ET AL., "The effect of the degree of chitosan deacetylation on the efficiency of gene transfection", BIOMATERIALS, (200410), vol. 25, no. 22, pages 5293 - 5301, XP004504220 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2003.12.036 | [X] - ROMOREN K. ET AL., "The influence of formulation variables on in vitro transfection efficiency and physicochemical properties of chitosan-based polyplexes", INT. J. PHARM., (20050811), vol. 261, no. 1-2, pages 115 - 127, XP003013917 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(03)00301-6 | [X] - HUANG M. ET AL., "Transfection efficiency of chitosan vectors: effect of polymer molecular weight and degree of deacetylation", J. CONTROL RELEASE, (20050902), vol. 106, no. 3, pages 391 - 406, XP005038459 | [X] - KöPING-HöGGARD M. ET AL., "Chitosan as a nonviral gene delivery system. Structure-property relationships and characteristics compared with polyethylenimine in vitro and after lung administration in vivo", GENE THER., (200107), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 1108 - 1121, XP002967348 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3301492 | [XP] - LAVERTU M. ET AL., "High efficiency gene transfer using chitosan/DNA nanoparticles with specific combinations of molecular weight and degree of deacetylation", BIOMATERIALS, (200609), vol. 27, no. 27, pages 4815 - 4824, XP005495427 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2006.04.029 |