EP1775568 - Cantilever array, method of manufacturing the array, and scanning probe microscope, sliding device of guide and rotating mechanism, sensor, homodyne laser interferometer, and laser Doppler interferometer with specimen light excitation function, using the array and cantilever [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakatsu, Hideki 9-18, Oyamadai 1-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0086 / JP | [2007/39] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
Kawakatsu, Hideki 32-13, Kaminoge 4-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0093 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002541.6 | 12.06.2002 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | JP20010184604 | 19.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001184604 | JP20020160482 | 31.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002160482 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1775568 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1775568 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N13/16, G12B21/08, G12B21/02, G12B21/22 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
G01B9/02045 (EP,US);
G01Q70/06 (EP,KR,US);
G01B9/02002 (EP,US);
G01H9/004 (EP,US);
G01Q20/02 (EP,US);
G01Q70/12 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y35/00 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2007/16] | Title | German: | Cantilever-Array, Verfahren zur Herstellung des Arrays sowie Rastersondenmikroskop, Gleitvorrichtung eines Führungs- und Rotationsmechanismus, Sensor, Homodyn-Laser-Interferometer und Laser-Dopplerinterferometer mit Funktion zur Lichtanregung der Probe unter Verwendung des Arrays und Cantilever | [2007/16] | English: | Cantilever array, method of manufacturing the array, and scanning probe microscope, sliding device of guide and rotating mechanism, sensor, homodyne laser interferometer, and laser Doppler interferometer with specimen light excitation function, using the array and cantilever | [2007/16] | French: | Ensemble d'éléments en porte-à-faux, procédé permettant de produire cet ensemble, et microscope-sonde à balayage, dispositif coulissant associé à un mécanisme de guidage et de rotation, capteur, interféromètre laser homodyne, et interféromètre laser Doppler avec fonction d'excitation lumineuse et usage de l'ensemble et du porte-à-faux | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 10.03.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02736066.8 / EP1411341 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH09218211 | [XA] - GROSCH G, "HYBRID FIBER-OPTIC/MICROMECHANICAL FREQUENCY ENCODING DISPLACEMENT SENSOR", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (19900401), vol. A23, no. 1 / 3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 1128 - 1131, XP000355805 [X] 1-3,5 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] * [A] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0924-4247(90)87101-N | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09218211 A 19970819 (HORIBA LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-5 |