EP1967530 - Natural rubber latex preservation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raffinerie Notre Dame - Orafti S.A. Rue Louis Maréchal 1 4360 Oreye / BE | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Booten, Karl Glabbeekstraat 106 3450 Geetbets / BE | 02 /
Hashim Bin Md Yatim, Amir 23 Jalan Nova U5/83 Subang Bestari 40150, Shah Alam Selangor / MY | 03 /
Singh, Manroshan No. 17, Sri Taman Cicely 36000 Teluk Intan Perak Darul Ridzuan / MY | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Koster, Nico Tiense Suikerraffinaderij N.V. Patent Department Aandorenstraat 1 3300 Tienen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Koster, Nico Tiense Suikerraffinaderij N.V. Aandorenstraat 1 B-3300 Tienen / BE | Application number, filing date | 07004651.1 | 07.03.2007 | [2008/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967530 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08C1/06, C08C1/08, C08K5/06, C08K5/15, C08L7/02 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
C08C1/06 (EP);
C08C1/08 (EP);
C08K5/04 (EP);
C08K5/15 (EP);
C08K5/20 (EP);
C08L7/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/04, C08L7/02 (EP);
C08K5/15, C08L7/02 (EP);
C08K5/20, C08L7/02 (EP);
C08L7/02, C08L2666/26 (EP) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/20] |
Former [2008/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kautschuklatexkonservierung | [2008/37] | English: | Natural rubber latex preservation | [2008/37] | French: | Préservation de latex de caoutchouc naturel | [2008/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB437758 (RUBBER PRODUCERS RES ASS, et al) [A] 1-26 * page 1, lines 32-37; claims 1-3 * * page 2, lines 16-44 * * page 2, line 105 - page 3, line 34 *; | [A]EP0703243 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [A]GB2405872 (NOVEXIN LTD [GB]) [A] 1-26 * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 17 *; | [A] - STEVENS C V ET AL, "Chemical modification of inulin, a valuable renewable resource, and its industrial applications", BIOMACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (2001), vol. 2, no. 1, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 1 - 16, XP002390021 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm005642t |