Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1834540 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2012 | B1 | EP1834540 | 14.05.2008 | A8 | EP1834540 | 19.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITCN20060004 | 17.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE542449T | 15.02.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITCN20060004 | 17.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITCN20060004 | 18.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITCN20060004 | 17.03.2006 |