Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.06.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
25.12.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] |
30.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
21.11.2008 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
19.11.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
19.11.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
23.09.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
19.09.2008 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
13.06.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
13.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
07.06.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.05.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
11.04.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
05.10.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |