EP1852295 - Exhaust system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 71287 Weissach / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritz, Andreas Auheckenstrasse 3/1 75443 Oetisheim / DE | [2007/45] | Application number, filing date | 07004847.5 | 09.03.2007 | [2007/45] | Priority number, date | DE20061020628 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006020628 | [2007/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1852295 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1852295 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60K13/04, F01N7/20 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
F01N13/082 (EP,US);
B60K13/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/29] |
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abgasanlage | [2007/45] | English: | Exhaust system | [2007/45] | French: | Système d'échappement | [2007/45] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 08.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.2009 | ES | 04.04.2009 | [2010/30] |
Former [2010/04] | ES | 04.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0396434 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 1,5,7 *; | [A]DE19940102 (MAGNA PEBRA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7* figure 1 *; | [A]DE10136350 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0008] * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1582713 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0018] * * figure 4 * |