Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007251925 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006116702 | 20.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20070104291 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006116702 | 20.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007285682 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006116702 | 20.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1847792 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006116702 | 20.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101071047 | 14.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006116702 | 20.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200801438 | 01.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006116702 | 20.04.2006 |