23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
30.05.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
21.06.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.04.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.04.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.12.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.12.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
16.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.10.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.05.2009 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.01.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.09.2008 |
First examination report |
|
20.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.08.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
25.07.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
08.04.2008 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
15.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|