Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9742338 | Global Dossier | 13.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72132796 | 26.09.1996 | US64341196 | 06.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4303315B | Global Dossier | 29.07.2009 | B2 | JPH10500287 | 13.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US24003094 | 09.05.1994 | US9505789 | 09.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0953052 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2009 | B1 | EP0953052 | 03.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9707697 | 05.05.1997 | US72132796 | 26.09.1996 | US64341196 | 06.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0772689 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2007 | B1 | EP0772689 | 14.05.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US24003094 | 09.05.1994 | US9505789 | 09.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2998597 | Global Dossier | 26.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9707697 | 05.05.1997 | US72132796 | 26.09.1996 | US64341196 | 06.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2585395 | Global Dossier | 29.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US24003094 | 09.05.1994 | US9505789 | 09.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1881075 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2013 | B1 | EP1881075 | 23.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP95920386 | 09.05.1995 | US24003094 | 09.05.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE424463T | 15.03.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US72132796 | 26.09.1996 | US64341196 | 06.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69535669T | 04.12.2008 | T2 | DE69535669D1 | 31.01.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US24003094 | 09.05.1994 | US9505789 | 09.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69739286D1 | 16.04.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9707697 | 05.05.1997 | US72132796 | 26.09.1996 | US64341196 | 06.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6013517 | 11.01.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US85096197 | 05.05.1997 | US43746595 | 09.05.1995 | US24003094 | 09.05.1994 | US72132796 | 26.09.1996 | US64341196 | 06.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6333195 | 25.12.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US85096197 | 05.05.1997 | US43746595 | 09.05.1995 | US47977600 | 07.01.2000 | US24003094 | 09.05.1994 | US72132796 | 26.09.1996 | US64341196 | 06.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9530763 | Global Dossier | 04.04.1996 | A3 | WO9530763 | 16.11.1995 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US24003094 | 09.05.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE381624T | 15.01.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US24003094 | 09.05.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2158977 | 10.11.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24003094 | 09.05.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2297831T | 01.05.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US24003094 | 09.05.1994 | Type | Earlier application | EP0772689 |