02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
11.08.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
26.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
02.09.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] |
01.09.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.09.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.09.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.04.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.04.2016 |
Change - German title |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
15.04.2016 |
Change - English title |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
15.04.2016 |
Change - French title |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
08.04.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] |
08.04.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] |
02.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.07.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
07.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.06.2009 |
First examination report |
|
05.06.2009 |
Change - inventor |
published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] |
30.01.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
19.12.2008 |
Change - German title |
published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] |
14.11.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
06.03.2008 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
06.03.2008 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
21.06.2007 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|