Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015264952 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514729227 | 03.06.2015 | US13823508 | 12.06.2008 | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008311272 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2002734 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2016 | B1 | EP2002734 | 17.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2634563 | 13.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1118508T | 12.07.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2002734T | 16.01.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA015938 | 30.12.2011 | B1 | EA200801300 | 27.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2605552T | 15.03.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GEP20104892 | 10.02.2010 | B | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20161600T | 30.12.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE031316T | 28.07.2017 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MEP00308 | 10.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20082613L | 15.12.2008 | L | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2002734T | 30.06.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2002734T | 03.01.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS55506 | 31.05.2017 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2002734T | 31.01.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA95465 | 10.08.2011 | C2 | Priority number | Date | EP07011615 | 13.06.2007 |