Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | Lapse: 05.10.2016 | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HU | | IE | | IS | Lapse: 05.02.2017 | IT | | LI | | LT | Lapse: 05.10.2016 | LU | Lapse: 13.06.2017 | LV | Lapse: 05.10.2016 | MC | Lapse: 05.10.2016 | MT | | NL | | PL | | PT | | RO | | SE | | SI | | SK | | TR | | Examination procedure | 25.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | European patent granted | 05.10.2016 | Opposition procedure | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.2017 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 17.12.2008 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 17.12.2008 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL BA HR MK RS | | Event date: | 04.03.2009 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20090116 | | Event date: | 08.07.2009 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20090612 | | Event date: | 08.07.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | WILD, HANS-PETER | | Event date: | 08.07.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | SALOM, RAFAEL | | Event date: | 08.07.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | ZALDUA, IGNACIO | | Event date: | 26.08.2009 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 26.08.2009 | | Event description: | EXTENSION FEES PAID | EXTENSION STATE: | AL | Payment DATE: | 20070613 | | Event date: | 26.08.2009 | | Event description: | EXTENSION FEES PAID | EXTENSION STATE: | BA | Payment DATE: | 20070613 | | Event date: | 26.08.2009 | | Event description: | EXTENSION FEES PAID | EXTENSION STATE: | HR | Payment DATE: | 20070613 | | Event date: | 26.08.2009 | | Event description: | EXTENSION FEES PAID | EXTENSION STATE: | MK | Payment DATE: | 20070613 | | Event date: | 26.08.2009 | | Event description: | EXTENSION FEES PAID | EXTENSION STATE: | RS | Payment DATE: | 20070613 | | Event date: | 11.05.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A23C 9/13 20060101ALI20160401BHEP | | Event date: | 11.05.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C13B 10/00 20110101ALI20160401BHEP | | Event date: | 11.05.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A23L 29/30 20160101AFI20160401BHEP | | Event date: | 11.05.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A23L 27/30 20160101ALI20160401BHEP | | Event date: | 11.05.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61P 3/10 20060101ALI20160401BHEP | | Event date: | 11.05.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A23L 2/60 20060101ALI20160401BHEP | | Event date: | 11.05.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 31/70 20060101ALI20160401BHEP | | Event date: | 11.05.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61P 9/02 20060101ALI20160401BHEP | | Event date: | 11.05.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A23L 2/02 20060101ALI20160401BHEP | | Event date: | 11.05.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61P 3/06 20060101ALI20160401BHEP | | Event date: | 11.05.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C13B 50/00 20110101ALI20160401BHEP | | Event date: | 18.05.2016 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20160419 | | Event date: | 05.10.2016 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL BA HR MK RS | | Event date: | 05.10.2016 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 01.04.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R079 602007048164 DE | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS | Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A23L0001090000 | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A23L0029300000 | | Event date: | 05.10.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 15.10.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 833793 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20161015 | | Event date: | 14.10.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | DIPL.-ING. HORST QUEHL PATENTANWALT, CH | | Event date: | 14.10.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 28.10.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL FP | Code Expl.: | TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY) | | Event date: | 02.11.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 17.11.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602007048164 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Event date: | 22.11.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 16.01.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | Effective DATE: | 20170109 | | Event date: | 02.02.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK T3 E 22446 SK | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK | | Event date: | 10.02.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MG4D | Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT | | Event date: | 28.02.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161005 | | Event date: | 15.03.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2605552 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20170315 | | Event date: | 28.04.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161005 | | Event date: | 26.06.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 31.07.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20170626 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 31.07.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161005 | | Event date: | 31.07.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20170531 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 31.07.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20170622 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 31.07.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20170531 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 31.07.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20170622 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 28.07.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E031316 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 31.08.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Payment DATE: | 20170529 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 31.08.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Payment DATE: | 20170601 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 31.08.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20170627 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 31.08.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20170626 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 31.08.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20170622 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 31.08.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20170626 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 31.08.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20170627 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 13.09.2017 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20170706 | | Event date: | 06.07.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602007048164 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Event date: | 29.09.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20170530 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 29.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG RO EPE | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA | | Event date: | 03.01.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A 2002734 PT 20170103 T | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20161227 | | Event date: | 13.10.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | ADM WILD VALENCIA SA, ES | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: WILD VALENCIA, S.A., ES | | Event date: | 02.11.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602007048164 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20170630 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 02.11.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602007048164 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | ADM WILD VALENCIA SA, ES | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: WILD VALENCIA S.A., CARCAIXENT, ES | | Event date: | 27.12.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES PC2A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSFER OF PATENT | OWNER: | ADM WILD VALENCIA SA | Effective DATE: | 20171227 | | Event date: | 31.01.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161005 | | Event date: | 23.02.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME | OWNER: | ADM WILD VALENCIA SA, ES | Effective DATE: | 20180119 | | Event date: | 28.02.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU HC9C | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME, ADDRESS | OWNER: | ADM WILD VALENCIA SA, ES | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER(S): WILD VALENCIA, S.A., ES | | Event date: | 14.03.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL HC | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME(S) OF PROPRIETOR(S) | OWNER: | ADM WILD VALENCIA SA; ES | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), CHANGE OF OWNER(S) NAME; FORMER OWNER NAME: WILD VALENCIA, S.A. | Effective DATE: | 20180130 | | Event date: | 30.04.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170613 | | Event date: | 01.06.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK TC4A E 22446 SK | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNER'S NAME | OWNER: | ADM WILD VALENCIA SA, CARCAIXENT VALENCIA, ES | Effective DATE: | 20180515 | | Event date: | 22.06.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 19.02.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE FP | Code Expl.: | TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY) | Effective DATE: | 20161125 | | Event date: | 19.02.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE HC | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME OF THE OWNERS | OWNER: | ADM WILD VALENCIA SA; ES | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), CHANGEMENT DE NOM DU PROPRIETAIRE; FORMER OWNER NAME: WILD VALENCIA, S.A. | Effective DATE: | 20171219 | | Event date: | 21.01.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EBP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT LAPSED | Effective DATE: | 20180630 | | Event date: | 29.01.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE EUG | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT HAS LAPSED | | Event date: | 31.01.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180613 | | Event date: | 31.01.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180614 | | Event date: | 31.01.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180613 | | Event date: | 31.01.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 06.02.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20180701 | | Event date: | 15.02.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MM01 833793 AT T | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180613 | | Event date: | 27.02.2019 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20180613 | | Event date: | 01.03.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK MM4A E 22446 SK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180613 | | Event date: | 06.03.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20180630 | | Event date: | 20.03.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Event date: | 29.03.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180701 | | Event date: | 29.03.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SI KO00 | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE OF PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20190215 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180613 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180613 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180614 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180630 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180613 | | Event date: | 30.04.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180630 | | Event date: | 31.05.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180614 | | Event date: | 31.05.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180630 | | Event date: | 31.05.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180613 | | Event date: | 15.07.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT UEP 833793 AT T | Code Expl.: | +PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION | Effective DATE: | 20161005 | | Event date: | 31.07.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180630 | | Event date: | 30.08.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190430 | | Event date: | 29.11.2019 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180613 | | Event date: | 30.11.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR TUEP P20161600 HR | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED | | Event date: | 30.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR T1PR P20161600 HR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA | | Event date: | 14.06.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20161600 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20190603 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 25.09.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR PNAN P20161600 HR | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE APPLICANT NAME, ADDRESS/RESIDENCE | OWNER: | ADM WILD VALENCIA SA, ES | | Event date: | 10.07.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20161600 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20200618 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 02.09.2016 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 01.09.2016 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 18.04.2016 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 14.11.2008 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 11.08.2017 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 30.06.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20170205 | | Event date: | 25.06.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20161600 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20210519 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20190613 | | Event date: | 11.08.2017 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 24.06.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20161600 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20220525 | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 29.07.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Payment DATE: | 20220520 | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 31.10.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Payment DATE: | 20220520 | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 31.10.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20220629 | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 12.07.2023 | | Event description: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230527 | | Event date: | 31.10.2023 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20230712 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.10.2023 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20230620 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 20.12.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR PBON P20161600 HR | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20230613 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20230613 | | Event date: | 31.01.2024 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20230613 | | Event date: | 03.01.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 602007048164 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20240103 | | Event date: | 15.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20240627 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20240625 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 01.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20240618 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 30.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20240620 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | |